CA SCR118 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month.
Title
Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR118 Wahab et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3297.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |