CA SCR122 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-22)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-22)
Status: Passed on August 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Chinese Americans in California.
Title
Chinese Americans in California.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR122 De Le (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-12 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR122 De Le (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-12 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR122 De Le (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4720.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6157.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3755.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |