CA SJR7 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Los Angeles Residential Helicopter Noise Relief Act of 2013.
Title
Los Angeles Residential Helicopter Noise Relief Act of 2013.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SJR7 Lieu Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SJR7 Lieu Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Lieu (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SJR7 Lieu Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 54 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SJR7 Lieu (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2040.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected August 28.) |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (August 14). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 578.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 569.) (April 16). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |