CO HB1001 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
Pending: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 8:15 am in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
Pending: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 8:15 am in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning reauthorization of the rural jump-start zone program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Reauthorization of Rural Jump-Start Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1001, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1001, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2024-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |