CO HB1008 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
Pending: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
Pending: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to expand general contractor accountability for wage claims involving contractors in the construction industry, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Wage Claims Construction Industry Contractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1008, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1008, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2024-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-18 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |