CO HB1011 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mortgage servicers, and, in connection therewith, requiring mortgage servicers to take certain actions regarding the disbursement of insurance proceeds to borrowers.
Title
Mortgage Servicers Disburse Insurance Proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1011, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2024-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-01-31 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |