CO HB1021 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Highway Restriction Violation Penalties
Title
Highway Restriction Violation Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1021 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1021, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-23 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |