CO HB1021 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the addition of representatives from Native American tribes with reservations in Colorado to the Colorado youth advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Youth Advisory Council Membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1021, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1021 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26 Governor Signed
2020-02-24 Sent to the Governor
2020-02-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-02-24HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-02-18SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-02-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-02-11SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-10SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-02-05SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-01-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-01-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-22HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-01-16HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1021
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1021_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1021_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1021_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1021_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1021_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1021_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e994c68f75180e9f872584f100739347-hb20-1021-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1021vote5a17ab
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6fd632cd9da94d618725850500800048-hb20-1021-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6fd632cd9da94d618725850500800048-hb20-1021-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1021vote60a466
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1021vote5ffe3b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1021vote5fea83

Bill Comments

feedback