CO HB1026 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
WICHE Equipment & Renovation Fee Approp Reqmnt
Title
WICHE Equipment & Renovation Fee Approp Reqmnt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1026 to Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1026 to Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1026 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1026 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1026 to Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1026 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1026 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2013-01-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-01-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-01-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-01-16 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |