CO HB1043 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-14)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-14)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the safety of children and youth through required background checks on adults when a child or youth is placed out of the home with kin, including relatives.
Title
Emergency And Continued Placement With Relative Or Kin
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment E). (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 23-1043, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2023-01-31 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-01-30 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |