CO HB1052 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the reinstatement of an income tax credit to help income-qualified seniors afford housing, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Senior Housing Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1052 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.009) (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.009) (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1052, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |