CO HB1071 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning permitting a name change for a person convicted of a felony to conform with the person's gender identity.
Title
Name Change to Conform with Gender Identity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.013) (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Prev ? (Y: 41 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Perm (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Amd (l.013) (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 24-1071 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2024-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-03-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-02-02 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-01-30 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |