CO HB1077 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FPPA Inv Confidentiality Revisions
Title
FPPA Inv Confidentiality Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1077 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1077 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1077 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1077 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-03-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-03-06 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | |
2012-02-09 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | House Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-06 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-02-01 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |