CO HB1077 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Illegal Traffic Stops License Revocation Hearings
Title
Illegal Traffic Stops License Revocation Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-02 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-29 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-28 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Re-referred to Appropriations |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-05 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |