CO HB1082 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the rights of a water rights easement holder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Rights Easements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1082, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Governor Signed
2019-03-18 Sent to the Governor
2019-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-03-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-03-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-02-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/01/2019
2019-02-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 02/27/2019
2019-02-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-20SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-05SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2019-01-31HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-01-30HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-01-28HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-11HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1082
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1082_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1082_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1082_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1082_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1082_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1082_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ba2eec32b1b03c2887258390007c179d-hb19-1082-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1082vote5b0ce5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ba2eec32b1b03c2887258390007c179d-hb19-1082-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd2bdfedfb599da1872583a100713326-hb19-1082-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cd2bdfedfb599da1872583a100713326-hb19-1082-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1082vote58fccc
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1082vote6a0dbf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1082vote6a1f98

Bill Comments

feedback