CO HB1083 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Patient Contribution Rehabilitation Services
Title
Patient Contribution Rehabilitation Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - reconsider The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1083 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - reconsider The motion passed on a vote of 6-1. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1083 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1083, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Referred to Appropriations - No Amendments |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-05 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |