CO HB1086 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Preparation Of Record County Court Appeals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preparation Of Record County Court Appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1086 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1086 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the motion to postpone indefinitely House Bill 13-1086 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 13-1086 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1086 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the motion to postpone indefinitely House Bill 13-1086 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 13-1086 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1086 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-15HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-03-08HouseSent to the Governor
2013-03-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-02-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-02-25SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-02-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2013-02-07HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-02-06HouseHouse Second Reading Passed
2013-01-31HouseHouse Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-01-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12AA5EA6AB2DBA0187257AEE00584752?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12AA5EA6AB2DBA0187257AEE00584752/$FILE/1086_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12AA5EA6AB2DBA0187257AEE00584752/$FILE/1086_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12AA5EA6AB2DBA0187257AEE00584752/$FILE/1086_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12AA5EA6AB2DBA0187257AEE00584752/$FILE/1086_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12AA5EA6AB2DBA0187257AEE00584752/$FILE/1086_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/12AA5EA6AB2DBA0187257AEE00584752/$FILE/1086_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A6424BBEFC62C13587257B04005E2676
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/730177E8EC994EBD87257B04005DE96D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4493FEE6A87D4A9B87257B04005E0489
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/63184462D2F2F78A87257B1D0072F6D2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A6424BBEFC62C13587257B04005E2676
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/730177E8EC994EBD87257B04005DE96D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4493FEE6A87D4A9B87257B04005E0489
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/63184462D2F2F78A87257B1D0072F6D2

Bill Comments

feedback