CO HB1086 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning health insurance coverage for an annual mental health wellness examination performed by a qualified mental health care provider, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Insurance Coverage Mental Health Wellness Exam
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Postpone House Bill 20-1086 indefinitely. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 21 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.002) (Y: 21 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Health & Insurance: Refer House Bill 20-1086, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-29 | House | House Committee on Health & Insurance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Insurance |