CO HB1101 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Progressive Raffles
Title
Progressive Raffles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 5-2. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1101, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 13-1101 to the Committee on Appropriations with a favorable recommendation (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |