CO HB1113 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Impact Fees Transparency
Title
Impact Fees Transparency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation to add the bill to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113 to the Committee of the Whole, without amendment, and with a recommendation to add the bill to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1113, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Committee on Local Government and Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government and Energy | |
2011-02-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-03 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-01-31 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |