CO HB1129 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning prohibiting a mental health care provider from engaging in conversion therapy with a patient under eighteen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit Conversion Therapy for A Minor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 19-1129 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1129, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 19-1129, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-09HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-05SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-03SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-02SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/01/2019
2019-03-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-03-26SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 03/27/2019
2019-03-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-22SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-03-21SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2019-02-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1129
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1129_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1129_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1129_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1129_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1129_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1129_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/48d91111f9c545b6872583a00061cd31-hb19-1129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/48d91111f9c545b6872583a00061cd31-hb19-1129-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1129vote6123d0
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/388e019f32a5438e872583c1006c26c2-hb19-1129-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1129vote69cd82
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1129vote62818c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1129vote6291a9

Bill Comments

feedback