CO HB1138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the credit an owner of a vehicle may receive for fees paid to register a motor vehicle when the vehicle is sold before the registration expires, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Vehicle Transfer Registration Fee Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1138 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1138 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1138 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1138 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1138 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1138, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1138 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1138, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-25 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2019-03-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance |
2019-01-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government + Finance |