CO HB1140 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the requirement that businesses licensed to sell powersports vehicles have a principal place of business.
Title
Powersports Vehicle Dealer Business Place
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1140 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1140 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 23-1140 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 23-1140 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Governor Signed | |
2023-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2023-02-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-02-21 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |