CO HB1145 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Admin Of Senior & Veterans Property Tax Exemptions
Title
Admin Of Senior & Veterans Property Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1145 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1145 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1145 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 13-0. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-30 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1145, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2013-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-30 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |