CO HB1147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning allowing children reasonable independence to engage in activities without finding that the child is abused or neglected.
Title
Reasonable Independence For Children In Activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 20-1147 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1147, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |