CO HB1155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Correct HB12-1268 Provisions That Effect Transfers
Title
Correct HB12-1268 Provisions That Effect Transfers
Sponsors
Rep. Cheri Gerou [R] | Sen. Mary Hodge [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1155 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2013-03-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |