CO HB1156 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modifications to certain administrative requirements specified in the "Colorado Municipal Election Code of 1965", and, in connection therewith, making modifications to provisions addressing the administration of the "Uniformed and Overseas Citizens Absentee Voting Act", mail ballots, nomination petitions, and affidavits for withdrawal from candidacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CO Colorado Municipal Election Code Administrative Modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1156 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 20-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20 Governor Signed
2020-03-16 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-02-25SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-19SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2020-02-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-05HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-01-30HouseHouse Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1156
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1156_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1156_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1156_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1156_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1156_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1156_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/54d6ccd62ed25997872584ff0070dca1-hb20-1156-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1156vote5c6f03
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/54d6ccd62ed25997872584ff0070dca1-hb20-1156-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b415844c0588dfea87258513007dbf56-hb20-1156-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1156vote5bb0ef

Bill Comments

feedback