CO HB1167 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-29 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sealing Drug Conviction Records
Title
Sealing Drug Conviction Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1167 to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-03-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-25 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-28 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |