CO HB1182 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legislative Digital Policy Advisory Committee
Title
Legislative Digital Policy Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182 to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1182, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Legislative Council Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Legislative Council |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2013-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-18 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |