CO HB1196 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning student financial assistance for students who are classified as in-state students for tuition purposes.
Title
Financial Aid For Students With In-state Tuition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |