CO HB1203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Funding For Digital Trunked Radio Sys Maintenance
Title
Funding For Digital Trunked Radio Sys Maintenance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1203 to the Committee of the Whole and add to the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1203, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1203, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1203, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-24 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |