CO HB1205 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concealed Handgun Exception
Title
Concealed Handgun Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1205 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1205 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1205 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1205 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1205 and reverse the previous roll call vote (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1205, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation. Members of the committee commented about their positions on the bill (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans & Military Affairs | |
2011-03-02 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-01 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |