CO HB1207 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow Driving With One Earphone
Title
Allow Driving With One Earphone
Sponsors
Rep. Jovan Melton [D] | Sen. Nancy Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1207 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1207, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-03-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2015-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |