CO HB1214 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community College Two-year Degree Programs
Title
Community College Two-year Degree Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1214 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1214 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1214, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1214, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-03 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1214 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1214, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1214, as amended, to the House Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-08 | Senate Second Reading Special Orders - Passed | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2012-04-24 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-23 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-04-16 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |