CO HB1232 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Use Of Epinephrine Auto-injectors
Title
Emergency Use Of Epinephrine Auto-injectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1232 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1232, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1232 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1232, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2015-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-03-30 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-13 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |