CO HB1257 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the scheduled repeal of reports by the department of natural resources to the general assembly.
Title
Reporting Requirements By Department Of Natural Resources To General Assembly
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1257 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1257 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1257 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1257 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |