CO HB1258 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning credit for the out-of-pocket expenses paid by a covered person when a health insurance carrier exits the market.
Title
Credit Covered Person Expenses Insurer Insolvency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1258 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 as amended (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1258 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1258 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 as amended (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1258, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 04/17/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-14 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |