CO HB1262 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Hearing: May 1 in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning maternal health, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Maternal Health Midwives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1262, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment X). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment W). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment V). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment U). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1262, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1262, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1262, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment X). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment W). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment V). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment U). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1262, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |