CO HB1266 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Information Technology Budget Request Process
Title
Information Technology Budget Request Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1266 to the Committee of the Whole. Consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1266 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1266 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-04-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-20 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-27 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |