CO HB1266 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the relocation of utility facilities in a local government right-of-way.
Title
Local Government Utility Relocation in Right-of-Way
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2024-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |