CO HB1268 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mineral Estate Disclosure Real Property Sale
Title
Mineral Estate Disclosure Real Property Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1268 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1268 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1268 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1268 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 13-1268 indefinitely (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1268 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1268 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2013-04-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-03-27 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |