CO HB1278 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 1:30 pm in Room SCR 357
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the continuation of the concurrent enrollment advisory board, and, in connection therewith, implementing the recommendation in the department of regulatory agencies' 2023 sunset report.
Title
Sunset Concurrent Enrollment Advisory Board
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Martinez [D] | Rep. Tammy Story [D] | Sen. James Coleman [D] | Rep. Jennifer Bacon [D] |
Rep. Iman Jodeh [D] | Rep. Julie McCluskie [D] | Rep. Michael Weissman [D] | Rep. Mary Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment L) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment L) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1278, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |