CO HB1281 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Newborn Heart Defect Screening Pulse Oximetry
Title
Newborn Heart Defect Screening Pulse Oximetry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1281 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1281 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1281, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services + Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-16 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-15 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-24 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |