CO HB1281 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the salary categorization of locally elected officers in specified counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change Salary Categorizations For Certain Counties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1281 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1281 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26 Governor Signed
2020-06-16 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-03-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government
2020-03-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-06HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-03-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1281
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1281_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1281_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1281_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1281_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1281_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1281_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ab3f824c7678d798725852000629b5b-hb20-1281-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1281vote5c1c00
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/01bf539153b560518725857400705bbe-hb20-1281-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1281vote59dd15

Bill Comments

feedback