CO HB1285 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the allocation of general fund money to provide support to creative arts industries, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Funding To Support Creative Arts Industries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 22 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 23 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 22 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.004) (Y: 23 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1285 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1285, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2021-05-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-28 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |