CO HB1293 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FY 2014-15 Legislative Dept Appropriation Bill
Title
FY 2014-15 Legislative Dept Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1293, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2014-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |