CO HB1298 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Craig Hospital Special License Plate
Title
Craig Hospital Special License Plate
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Spence [R] | Rep. Max Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1298 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-18 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-04 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations | |
2011-05-03 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-02 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-04-29 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-20 | House Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-04-13 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation + Appropriations |