CO HB1303 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
DORA Certify Speech-language Pathologists
Title
DORA Certify Speech-language Pathologists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW A (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW A (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW A (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.005 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.004 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-05-08 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2012-05-04 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2012-03-30 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2012-03-27 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-23 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-16 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-07 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2012-02-28 | House Committee on Health and Environment Refer Amended to Finance | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health and Environment |