CO HB1320 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creating a task force to study school staff safety issues, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Educator Safety Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1320, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1320, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1320, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1320, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1320, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 24-1320, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2024-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-18 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |