CO HB1322 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the use of money from certain state funds to expand the supply of affordable housing statewide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand Supply Affordable Housing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1322 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1322 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.006 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1322, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment K) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1322, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1322, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Governor Signed
2019-05-03SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-30SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-29SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2019-04-26HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-25HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1322
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1322_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1322_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1322_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1322_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1322_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b730a489c92cc646872583df007a936d-hb19-1322-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/836a9c2815a94f9a872583e700525095-hb19-1322-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/836a9c2815a94f9a872583e700525095-hb19-1322-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1322vote59d419
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b730a489c92cc646872583df007a936d-hb19-1322-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/b730a489c92cc646872583df007a936d-hb19-1322-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/aaf1efea9aef499a872583ec000a4028-hb19-1322-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/141b1df638363a28872583ec006f3196-hb19-1322-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1322vote5679f7

Bill Comments

feedback